THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:27:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Grand River Hospital
Department of Oncology
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Oncology
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: 519-621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital - Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
Emergency Department
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Phone: 519-272-8210
Extension: 8200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Obaidullah Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Khan (CPSO#: 118437 )
Business Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Grand River Hospital
Department of Oncology
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Oncology
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: 519-621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital - Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
Emergency Department
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Phone: 519-272-8210
Extension: 8200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Obaidullah Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Khan (CPSO#: 118437 )
Business Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OBAIDULLAH KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OBAIDULLAH KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019