THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:54:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. H. Thach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Thach (CPSO#: 118441 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. H. Thach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Thach (CPSO#: 118441 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERENCE HUY THACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERENCE HUY THACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019