THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:46:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children (SickKids)
Division of Respiratory Medicine
4529 Hill Wing
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-6168
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 302-10 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Phone: (905) 876-5056
Fax: (289) 670-2176
Address: 3-5283 Rutherford Rd
Woodbridge ON L4H 2T2
Phone: (905) 264-8311
Fax: (905) 264-0801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Respirology
Effective: 19 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children (SickKids)
Division of Respiratory Medicine
4529 Hill Wing
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-6168
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 302-10 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Phone: (905) 876-5056
Fax: (289) 670-2176
Address: 3-5283 Rutherford Rd
Woodbridge ON L4H 2T2
Phone: (905) 264-8311
Fax: (905) 264-0801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Respirology
Effective: 19 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHUL VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHUL VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019