THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:42:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lake of the Woods District
Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Lake of the Woods Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora, ON
P9N 3W7
Date Received: 04 Feb 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorraine Dooley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dooley (CPSO#: 118459 )
Business Address: Site 1
Paddy Lake Road
Keewatin Ontario P0X1C0
807 468 9861 Extn: 2530

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lake of the Woods District
Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Lake of the Woods Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora, ON
P9N 3W7
Date Received: 04 Feb 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorraine Dooley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dooley (CPSO#: 118459 )
Business Address: Site 1
Paddy Lake Road
Keewatin Ontario P0X1C0
807 468 9861 Extn: 2530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORRAINE DOOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORRAINE DOOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019