THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Extension: 3030
Fax: 6476941424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TANOLI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Tanoli (CPSO#: 118466 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
905-883-1212
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
(905) 417-2000
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Extension: 3030
Fax: 6476941424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TANOLI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Tanoli (CPSO#: 118466 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
905-883-1212
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
(905) 417-2000
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAID SAIFULLAH KHAN TANOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANOLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAID SAIFULLAH KHAN TANOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANOLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019