THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 23:25:50 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7325 Yonge St
INNISFIL HEALTH COLLABORATIVE
suite 2300
Innisfil ON L9S 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054362251
Fax: 7054367991

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ranjbar-Pazoki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ranjbar-Pazoki (CPSO#: 118472 )
Business Address: 4 The Market Place
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M1
(416) 690-3412
Business Address: 1081 Innisfil Beach Rd
1081 INNISFIL BEACH ROAD
Innisfil ON L9S 0N2
Business Address: 2300-7325 Yonge St
Innisfil ON L9S 2M6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7325 Yonge St
INNISFIL HEALTH COLLABORATIVE
suite 2300
Innisfil ON L9S 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054362251
Fax: 7054367991

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ranjbar-Pazoki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ranjbar-Pazoki (CPSO#: 118472 )
Business Address: 4 The Market Place
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M1
(416) 690-3412
Business Address: 1081 Innisfil Beach Rd
1081 INNISFIL BEACH ROAD
Innisfil ON L9S 0N2
Business Address: 2300-7325 Yonge St
Innisfil ON L9S 2M6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM RANJBAR-PAZOKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANJBAR-PAZOKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM RANJBAR-PAZOKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANJBAR-PAZOKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2019