THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:01:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aleppo, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Internal Medicine department
Pacemaker Clinic
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5196945540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 01 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rami Abazid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abazid (CPSO#: 118482 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Aleppo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Internal Medicine department
Pacemaker Clinic
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5196945540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 01 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rami Abazid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abazid (CPSO#: 118482 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 May 2024
30 Apr 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 30 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RAMI MAHMOOD ABAZID may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Clinical Sciences Division, at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. ABAZID holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ABAZID no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ABAZID’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ABAZID’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 April, 2031.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RAMI MAHMOOD ABAZID may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Clinical Sciences Division, at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. ABAZID holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ABAZID no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ABAZID’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ABAZID’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 April, 2031.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Aleppo, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Apr 2031

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019