THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:27:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch Street
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JOEL SARDINHA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sardinha (CPSO#: 118540 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch Street
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JOEL SARDINHA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sardinha (CPSO#: 118540 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Jul 2024
30 Jul 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 31 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jul 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOEL ARON SARDINHA may practise anesthesiology at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Brampton Civic Hospital in Brampton, Ontario; and

(ii) Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness in Brampton, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SARDINHA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. SARDINHA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. SARDINHA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 31 July, 2024, and will expire on or before 30 July, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOEL ARON SARDINHA may practise anesthesiology at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Brampton Civic Hospital in Brampton, Ontario; and

(ii) Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness in Brampton, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SARDINHA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. SARDINHA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. SARDINHA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 31 July, 2024, and will expire on or before 30 July, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jul 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019