THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:46:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-366 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054551455
Fax: 9054557485

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Inderjit Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Kaur (CPSO#: 118584 )
Business Address: 201-366 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-366 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054551455
Fax: 9054557485

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Inderjit Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Kaur (CPSO#: 118584 )
Business Address: 201-366 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Oct 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 29 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. INDERJIT KAUR may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. INDERJIT KAUR may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2019