THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:18:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: Zhang, Xiao Tong (Used Until: 20 May 2019)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-155 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059455476
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre - Satellite Health Facility Hamilton
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre - Satellite Health Facility
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: XT ZHANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Zhang (CPSO#: 118591 )
Business Address: 2264482892
Business Address: 100-155 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P2

General Information

Former Name: Zhang, Xiao Tong (Used Until: 20 May 2019)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-155 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059455476
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre - Satellite Health Facility Hamilton
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre - Satellite Health Facility
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: XT ZHANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Zhang (CPSO#: 118591 )
Business Address: 2264482892
Business Address: 100-155 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY XIAOTONG ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY XIAOTONG ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019