THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:00:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-66 Josephine St
North Bay ON P1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-495-2685
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Roscoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Roscoe (CPSO#: 118639 )
Business Address: 6 Francis Ave
North Bay ON P1C 1A8
705-495-2685

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-66 Josephine St
North Bay ON P1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-495-2685
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Roscoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Roscoe (CPSO#: 118639 )
Business Address: 6 Francis Ave
North Bay ON P1C 1A8
705-495-2685

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS RAY TREVOR ROSCOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSCOE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS RAY TREVOR ROSCOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSCOE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019