THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:41:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
Niagara Health St. Catharines Site
Emergency Department
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
Niagara Health St. Catharines Site
Emergency Department
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH MARIANNE BYCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYCE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH MARIANNE BYCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYCE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019