THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:25:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Rd 3 N
Algonquin Family Health Team
Suite 104
Huntsville ON P1H 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2355
Fax: (705) 789-1051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dufour Lamontagne Biasutti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Biasutti (CPSO#: 115315 ) Dr. A. Dufour Lamontagne (CPSO#: 118645 )
Business Address: 104-348 Muskoka Rd 3 N
Huntsville ON P1H 1H8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Rd 3 N
Algonquin Family Health Team
Suite 104
Huntsville ON P1H 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2355
Fax: (705) 789-1051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dufour Lamontagne Biasutti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Biasutti (CPSO#: 115315 ) Dr. A. Dufour Lamontagne (CPSO#: 118645 )
Business Address: 104-348 Muskoka Rd 3 N
Huntsville ON P1H 1H8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANABELLE DUFOUR LAMONTAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFOUR LAMONTAGNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANABELLE DUFOUR LAMONTAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFOUR LAMONTAGNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019