THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:03:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JESSICA KENT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kent (CPSO#: 118648 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JESSICA KENT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kent (CPSO#: 118648 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA TAYLOR ANNE KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA TAYLOR ANNE KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019