THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:07:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8077373030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Loud (CPSO#: 118651 )
Business Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T1B4
(807)737-3803

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8077373030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Loud (CPSO#: 118651 )
Business Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T1B4
(807)737-3803

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAM ELLIOTT DUNN LOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAM ELLIOTT DUNN LOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019