THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:28:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Pediatrics
Unit B
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054958115
Fax: 705-495-8114
Address: 400 McKeown Ave
North Bay ON P1B 0B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay Regional Health Center
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Violin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Violin (CPSO#: 118658 )
Business Address: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Pediatrics
Unit B
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
705-495-8115

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Pediatrics
Unit B
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054958115
Fax: 705-495-8114
Address: 400 McKeown Ave
North Bay ON P1B 0B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay Regional Health Center
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Violin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Violin (CPSO#: 118658 )
Business Address: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Pediatrics
Unit B
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
705-495-8115

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALICIA LAUREN VIOLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIOLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALICIA LAUREN VIOLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIOLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019