THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:54:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Hospital
Hospitalist Office
Level 2 Centre Tower
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055222200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GENEVIEVE PATRICIA EATON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Eaton (CPSO#: 118662 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Hospital
Hospitalist Office
Level 2 Centre Tower
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055222200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GENEVIEVE PATRICIA EATON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Eaton (CPSO#: 118662 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE PATRICIA EATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EATON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE PATRICIA EATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EATON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019