THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:21:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Zhang, Zhaonan (Used Until: 18 Mar 2021)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057812311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PETER ZHANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zhang (CPSO#: 118670 )
Business Address: 100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON P1H 1H7
7057892311

General Information

Former Name: Zhang, Zhaonan (Used Until: 18 Mar 2021)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057812311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PETER ZHANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zhang (CPSO#: 118670 )
Business Address: 100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON P1H 1H7
7057892311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER ZHAONAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER ZHAONAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019