THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:52:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Medicine
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Phone: 519-941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yang (CPSO#: 118732 )
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Medicine
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Phone: 519-941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yang (CPSO#: 118732 )
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019