THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:36:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Firestone Institute for Respiratory
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: 905-521-6183
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
Niagara Health System-St. Catherine's Hospital
Department of Medicine, Division of Internal Medicine
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 9056847271
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1011-123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1G6
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MANPREET BASUITA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Basuita (CPSO#: 118741 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Firestone Institute for Respiratory
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
905-522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Firestone Institute for Respiratory
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: 905-521-6183
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
Niagara Health System-St. Catherine's Hospital
Department of Medicine, Division of Internal Medicine
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 9056847271
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1011-123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1G6
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MANPREET BASUITA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Basuita (CPSO#: 118741 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Firestone Institute for Respiratory
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
905-522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANPREET SINGH BASUITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASUITA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANPREET SINGH BASUITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASUITA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019