THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:35:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Hamilton Street North
Waterdown Family Medical Clinic
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-689-6134
Fax: 905-689-5665

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Liao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Liao (CPSO#: 118764 )
Business Address: 1-95 Hamilton St N
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Hamilton Street North
Waterdown Family Medical Clinic
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-689-6134
Fax: 905-689-5665

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Liao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Liao (CPSO#: 118764 )
Business Address: 1-95 Hamilton St N
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MICHELLE LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MICHELLE LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019