THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:14:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-20 Emma St
Thamesview Family Health Team
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519.354.5290
Fax: 519.354.9011
Address: 20 Emma St
Thamesview FHT
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELYSE EPP MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Epp (CPSO#: 118768 )
Business Address: 20 Emma Street
Suite 103
Chatham Ontario N7L 1A7
519 354 5290

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-20 Emma St
Thamesview Family Health Team
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519.354.5290
Fax: 519.354.9011
Address: 20 Emma St
Thamesview FHT
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELYSE EPP MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Epp (CPSO#: 118768 )
Business Address: 20 Emma Street
Suite 103
Chatham Ontario N7L 1A7
519 354 5290

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELYSE MARIE EPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EPP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELYSE MARIE EPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EPP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019