THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:40:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: Liu, Yijia (Used Until: 26 Apr 2021)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 346 Platt's Lane
Primary Care Diabetes Support Program
London ON N6G 1J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 67268
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 254-785 Wonderland Rd S
Westmount Family Physicians
London ON N6K 1M6
Phone: 226-272-0272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NGO AND DR. LIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liu (CPSO#: 118778 ) Dr. G. Ngo (CPSO#: 114927 )
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: Liu, Yijia (Used Until: 26 Apr 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 346 Platt's Lane
Primary Care Diabetes Support Program
London ON N6G 1J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 67268
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 254-785 Wonderland Rd S
Westmount Family Physicians
London ON N6K 1M6
Phone: 226-272-0272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NGO AND DR. LIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liu (CPSO#: 118778 ) Dr. G. Ngo (CPSO#: 114927 )
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA YIJIA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA YIJIA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019