THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:50:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 University Ave
Geriatric Medicine Clinic
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165973422
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Acute Ambulatory Care Unit
Ground Floor
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 4163237302
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriella Jacob Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jacob (CPSO#: 118788 )
Business Address: 550 University Avenue
Ground Floor
Geriatric Medicine Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
4165973422 Extn: 3065

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 University Ave
Geriatric Medicine Clinic
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165973422
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Acute Ambulatory Care Unit
Ground Floor
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 4163237302
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriella Jacob Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jacob (CPSO#: 118788 )
Business Address: 550 University Avenue
Ground Floor
Geriatric Medicine Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
4165973422 Extn: 3065

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIELLA STACY JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIELLA STACY JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019