THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 06:29:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Hospital
Medical Oncology
Toronto Ontario M5G
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Aug 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Hospital
Medical Oncology
Toronto Ontario M5G
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Aug 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIAN XIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIAN XIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019