THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:59:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Family Health Team
Department Of Family Medicine
581 Davis Dr., Suite 201
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058533103
Fax: 9058532533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julian Carmine Manzone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Manzone (CPSO#: 118801 )
Business Address: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
905-853-3103

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Family Health Team
Department Of Family Medicine
581 Davis Dr., Suite 201
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058533103
Fax: 9058532533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julian Carmine Manzone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Manzone (CPSO#: 118801 )
Business Address: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
905-853-3103

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIAN CARMINE MANZONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANZONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIAN CARMINE MANZONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANZONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019