THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:44:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-5927 Bathurst St
North York ON M2R 3T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162232040
Fax: 6476892063
Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 146 Oliver Rd
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Campbellford ON K0L 1L0
Phone: 7056531140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. LOEWENTHAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loewenthal (CPSO#: 118807 )
Business Address: 104-5927 Bathurst St
North York ON M2R 3T5
4162232040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-5927 Bathurst St
North York ON M2R 3T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162232040
Fax: 6476892063
Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 146 Oliver Rd
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Campbellford ON K0L 1L0
Phone: 7056531140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. LOEWENTHAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loewenthal (CPSO#: 118807 )
Business Address: 104-5927 Bathurst St
North York ON M2R 3T5
4162232040

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENACHEM MENDEL LOEWENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOEWENTHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENACHEM MENDEL LOEWENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOEWENTHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019