THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Oncology
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARIA DANIEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Daniel (CPSO#: 118828 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Oncology
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARIA DANIEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Daniel (CPSO#: 118828 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA NISHANTHINI DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA NISHANTHINI DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019