THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 418 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 479-8410
Fax: 647-480-0879

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Safiyyah Mahomed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mahomed (CPSO#: 118854 )
Business Address: 825 Church St
Unit 902
Toronto ON M4W 3Z4
4166627554
Business Address: 59-1960 Dalmagarry Rd
London ON N6G 0T8
4166627554

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 418 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 479-8410
Fax: 647-480-0879

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Safiyyah Mahomed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mahomed (CPSO#: 118854 )
Business Address: 825 Church St
Unit 902
Toronto ON M4W 3Z4
4166627554
Business Address: 59-1960 Dalmagarry Rd
London ON N6G 0T8
4166627554

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAFIYYAH ROOKAIYA MAHOMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHOMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAFIYYAH ROOKAIYA MAHOMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHOMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019