THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:07:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3780 Fallowfield Rd
Unit 9
Nepean ON K2J 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-820-3694
Fax: 613-820-3695
Address: 105A-460 West Hunt Club Rd
Nepean ON K2E 0B8
Phone: 613-0369-8369
Fax: 613-369-8354
Address: Suite 305
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 728-7700
Fax: (613) 728-5848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. S. PIEDRA ABU SHARAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Piedra Abu Sharar (CPSO#: 118904 )
Business Address: 9-3780 Fallowfield Rd
Nepean ON K2J 1A1
(613) 820-3694
Business Address: 460 West Hunt Club Rd
Suite 105A
Nepean ON K2E 0B8
(613) 369-8369

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3780 Fallowfield Rd
Unit 9
Nepean ON K2J 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-820-3694
Fax: 613-820-3695
Address: 105A-460 West Hunt Club Rd
Nepean ON K2E 0B8
Phone: 613-0369-8369
Fax: 613-369-8354
Address: Suite 305
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 728-7700
Fax: (613) 728-5848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. S. PIEDRA ABU SHARAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Piedra Abu Sharar (CPSO#: 118904 )
Business Address: 9-3780 Fallowfield Rd
Nepean ON K2J 1A1
(613) 820-3694
Business Address: 460 West Hunt Club Rd
Suite 105A
Nepean ON K2E 0B8
(613) 369-8369

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHADY PIEDRA ABU SHARAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIEDRA ABU SHARAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHADY PIEDRA ABU SHARAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIEDRA ABU SHARAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019