THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:22:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SOHAIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sohail (CPSO#: 118930 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
9054942120
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-7373
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SOHAIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sohail (CPSO#: 118930 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
9054942120
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-7373
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHMIR SOHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHMIR SOHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019