THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:20:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: 705-759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BENJAMIN MOREAU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moreau (CPSO#: 118934 )
Business Address: 89 1/2 Bay St
Kingston ON K7K 1H7
Business Address: 17 Caddy Ave
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 6H6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: 705-759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BENJAMIN MOREAU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moreau (CPSO#: 118934 )
Business Address: 89 1/2 Bay St
Kingston ON K7K 1H7
Business Address: 17 Caddy Ave
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 6H6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JOHN-PAUL MOREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JOHN-PAUL MOREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019