THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Belarusian State Medical University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BELARUSIAN, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134767870
Fax: 6134766482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liauchonak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Liauchonak (CPSO#: 118947 )
Business Address: 230 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
6134767870
Business Address: 5A-389 Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613-476-7870

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BELARUSIAN, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Belarusian State Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134767870
Fax: 6134766482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liauchonak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Liauchonak (CPSO#: 118947 )
Business Address: 230 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
6134767870
Business Address: 5A-389 Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613-476-7870

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRYNA LIAUCHONAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAUCHONAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRYNA LIAUCHONAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAUCHONAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Belarusian State Medical University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019