THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2330 Kennedy Road
Your Total Health Centre
Suite 302
Toronto Ontario M1T 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)298-1303
Fax: (416)298-4872
Address: 1390 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Unit A8
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0A1
Phone: 905-884-7711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Ashvini Shanmugarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shanmugarajah (CPSO#: 118968 )
Business Address: 308-1371 Neilson Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
4162837701

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2330 Kennedy Road
Your Total Health Centre
Suite 302
Toronto Ontario M1T 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)298-1303
Fax: (416)298-4872
Address: 1390 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Unit A8
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0A1
Phone: 905-884-7711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Ashvini Shanmugarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shanmugarajah (CPSO#: 118968 )
Business Address: 308-1371 Neilson Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
4162837701

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA ASHVINI SHANMUGARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGARAJAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA ASHVINI SHANMUGARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019