THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 03:11:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northwestern University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5912
Fax: 416-864-5175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Cuthbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cuthbert (CPSO#: 118990 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
416-864-5912

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northwestern University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5912
Fax: 416-864-5175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Cuthbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cuthbert (CPSO#: 118990 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
416-864-5912

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE ANA CUTHBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTHBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE ANA CUTHBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTHBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northwestern University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019