THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:57:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Silver Star Blvd
2nd Floor
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 502-2029
Fax: (416) 502-8710
Address: 5292 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 5P9
Phone: (416) 223-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GRACE PENG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Peng (CPSO#: 119028 )
Business Address: 300 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
(416) 502-2029

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Silver Star Blvd
2nd Floor
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 502-2029
Fax: (416) 502-8710
Address: 5292 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 5P9
Phone: (416) 223-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GRACE PENG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Peng (CPSO#: 119028 )
Business Address: 300 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
(416) 502-2029

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRACE YATING PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRACE YATING PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019