THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:07:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-130 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L5A 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-559-8278
Fax: 416-486-5508
Address: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. KWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kwan (CPSO#: 119043 )
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-130 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L5A 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-559-8278
Fax: 416-486-5508
Address: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. KWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kwan (CPSO#: 119043 )
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ANG KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ANG KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019