THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:22:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Microbiology Department
Room W-1 1-88
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam S. Komorowski Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Komorowski (CPSO#: 119048 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
905-521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Microbiology Department
Room W-1 1-88
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam S. Komorowski Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Komorowski (CPSO#: 119048 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
905-521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM STANLEY KOMOROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMOROWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM STANLEY KOMOROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMOROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019