THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 75111
Fax: 519-685-8098

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Spencer Van Mil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Van Mil (CPSO#: 119069 )
Business Address: 100 Main St W
4th Floor
Hamilton ON L8P 3G1
905-525-9140 Extn: 24881

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 75111
Fax: 519-685-8098

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Spencer Van Mil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Van Mil (CPSO#: 119069 )
Business Address: 100 Main St W
4th Floor
Hamilton ON L8P 3G1
905-525-9140 Extn: 24881

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPENCER VAN MIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN MIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPENCER VAN MIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN MIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019