THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: Peters, Shannon Elizabeth (Used Until: 04 Jul 2023)
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-523 The Queensway
Toronto West Medical
Etobicoke ON M8Y 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167608367
Fax: 4167607212
Address: 125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 001
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Phone: 705-503-6700
Fax: 705-503-6702

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Peters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peters-Lloyd (CPSO#: 119108 )
Business Address: 1-523 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON M8Y 1J7

General Information

Former Name: Peters, Shannon Elizabeth (Used Until: 04 Jul 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-523 The Queensway
Toronto West Medical
Etobicoke ON M8Y 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167608367
Fax: 4167607212
Address: 125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 001
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Phone: 705-503-6700
Fax: 705-503-6702

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Peters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peters-Lloyd (CPSO#: 119108 )
Business Address: 1-523 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON M8Y 1J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH PETERS-LLOYD-LLOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS-LLOYD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH PETERS-LLOYD-LLOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS-LLOYD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019