THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
699 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 62491
Fax: (905) 575-6340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 21 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
699 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 62491
Fax: (905) 575-6340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 21 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Mar 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 21 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. TOBIAS BERG may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology, Division of Hematology, McMaster University, in which Dr. BERG holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. BERG no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. TOBIAS BERG may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology, Division of Hematology, McMaster University, in which Dr. BERG holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. BERG no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2019