THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 14:08:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-6542
Fax: 905-494-6416
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health System
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. NORMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL INC
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Norman (CPSO#: 119175 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-6542
Fax: 905-494-6416
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health System
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. NORMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL INC
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Norman (CPSO#: 119175 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAVANNAH NORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAVANNAH NORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019