THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:22:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Medicine
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2390 Concession Rd
Kemptville District Hospital
Emergency Medicine
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Legget Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2K 2W2
Phone: 6135920862
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. BOTROS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Botros (CPSO#: 119195 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Address: 2649 Concession Rd
Kemptville District Hospital
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Address: 525 Legget Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2K 2W2
Business Address: 526 Anchor Circle
Ottawa Ontario K4M 0X5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Medicine
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2390 Concession Rd
Kemptville District Hospital
Emergency Medicine
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Legget Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2K 2W2
Phone: 6135920862
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. BOTROS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Botros (CPSO#: 119195 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Address: 2649 Concession Rd
Kemptville District Hospital
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Address: 525 Legget Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2K 2W2
Business Address: 526 Anchor Circle
Ottawa Ontario K4M 0X5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYES BOTROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTROS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYES BOTROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTROS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019