THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:35:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Chile Facultad de Medicina, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Avenue
Toronto General Hospital
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
1 PMB-298
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163404800
Extension: 2760
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. FELIPE SANCHEZ TIJMES MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sanchez Tijmes (CPSO#: 119210 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging416-340-4800
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
4163404800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Chile Facultad de Medicina, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Avenue
Toronto General Hospital
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
1 PMB-298
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163404800
Extension: 2760
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. FELIPE SANCHEZ TIJMES MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sanchez Tijmes (CPSO#: 119210 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging416-340-4800
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
4163404800

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Apr 2024
24 Apr 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 25 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 24 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FELIPE ANTONIO SANCHEZ TIJMES may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SANCHEZ TIJMES holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SANCHEZ TIJMES no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SANCHEZ TIJMES’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SANCHEZ TIJMES’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 April, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 24 April, 2031.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FELIPE ANTONIO SANCHEZ TIJMES may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SANCHEZ TIJMES holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SANCHEZ TIJMES no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SANCHEZ TIJMES’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SANCHEZ TIJMES’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 April, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 24 April, 2031.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Chile Facultad de Medicina, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 24 Apr 2031

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019