THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 20:30:01 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de las Am‚ricas Puebla, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RIVERA-THEUREL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rivera Theurel (CPSO#: 119258 )
Business Address: 347 Rumsey Rd
Toronto ON M4G 1R7
6472298974

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de las Am‚ricas Puebla, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RIVERA-THEUREL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rivera Theurel (CPSO#: 119258 )
Business Address: 347 Rumsey Rd
Toronto ON M4G 1R7
6472298974

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jan 2024
31 Dec 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Dec 31 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FERNANDO RIVERA THEUREL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation, University of Toronto, in which Dr. RIVERA THEUREL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RIVERA THEUREL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RIVERA THEUREL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RIVERA THEUREL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 December, 2030.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FERNANDO RIVERA THEUREL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation, University of Toronto, in which Dr. RIVERA THEUREL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RIVERA THEUREL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RIVERA THEUREL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RIVERA THEUREL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 December, 2030.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de las Am‚ricas Puebla, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019