THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:20:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ioannina, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Division of Neurology
Hamilton Ontario L8L2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 40533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR ARISTEIDIS KATSANOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Katsanos (CPSO#: 119318 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, GREEK
Medical School: University of Ioannina, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Division of Neurology
Hamilton Ontario L8L2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 40533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR ARISTEIDIS KATSANOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Katsanos (CPSO#: 119318 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Mar 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 04 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ARISTEIDIS KATSANOS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, McMaster University, in which Dr. KATSANOS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KATSANOS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KATSANOS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KATSANOS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 October, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. KATSANOS's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ARISTEIDIS KATSANOS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, McMaster University, in which Dr. KATSANOS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KATSANOS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KATSANOS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KATSANOS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 October, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. KATSANOS's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ioannina, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019