THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:07:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
UHN - Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 10 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IGOR NOVITZKY BASSO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Novitzky Basso (CPSO#: 119348 )
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
UHN - Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 10 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IGOR NOVITZKY BASSO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Novitzky Basso (CPSO#: 119348 )
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 May 2022
09 May 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 10 2022
EXPIRY DATE: May 09 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. IGOR NICOLAS NOVITZKY BASSO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Hematology at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. NOVITZKY BASSO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. NOVITZKY BASSO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. NOVITZKY BASSO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. NOVITZKY BASSO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 10 May, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 09 May, 2029.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. IGOR NICOLAS NOVITZKY BASSO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Hematology at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. NOVITZKY BASSO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. NOVITZKY BASSO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. NOVITZKY BASSO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. NOVITZKY BASSO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 10 May, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 09 May, 2029.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Mar 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 May 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 09 May 2029

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019