THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:35:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5878938487
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aman Wadhwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wadhwani (CPSO#: 119349 )
Business Address: 40 Withrow Ave
Nepean ON K2G 2H8
Business Address: 27 Wallaby Way
Brampton ON L6R 3G1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5878938487
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aman Wadhwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wadhwani (CPSO#: 119349 )
Business Address: 40 Withrow Ave
Nepean ON K2G 2H8
Business Address: 27 Wallaby Way
Brampton ON L6R 3G1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAN WADHWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAN WADHWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019