THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:05:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1262 Don Mills Rd
Unit 62
North York ON M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163357474
Fax: 4163328593

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pain Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wong (CPSO#: 119350 )
Business Address: 1262 Don Mills Rd
Unit 62
North York ON M3B 2W7
4163357474

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1262 Don Mills Rd
Unit 62
North York ON M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163357474
Fax: 4163328593

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pain Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wong (CPSO#: 119350 )
Business Address: 1262 Don Mills Rd
Unit 62
North York ON M3B 2W7
4163357474

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Dec 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 10 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANDREA CALPURNIA WONG may practise medicine independently in pain medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANDREA CALPURNIA WONG may practise medicine independently in pain medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019