THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:13:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lebanese University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 1424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GILBERT MAROUN M.D. INC.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maroun (CPSO#: 119365 )
Business Address: 192 Tower Dr
Scarborough ON M1R 3P7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Lebanese University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 1424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GILBERT MAROUN M.D. INC.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maroun (CPSO#: 119365 )
Business Address: 192 Tower Dr
Scarborough ON M1R 3P7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2022
30 Jun 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GILBERT MAROUN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Vascular and Interventional Radiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MAROUN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MAROUN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MAROUN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MAROUN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 June, 2029.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GILBERT MAROUN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Vascular and Interventional Radiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MAROUN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MAROUN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MAROUN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MAROUN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 June, 2029.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lebanese University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2029

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019